This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 20:46:45 (UTC).

HYAM COHEN ET AL VS A W CHESTERTON COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2008 HYAM COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE SMALLEY EDMON, AURELIO MUNOZ and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5929

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

AURELIO MUNOZ

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COHEN DIANE

COHEN HYAM

Defendants and Respondents

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

AETNA INSULATED WIRE COMPANY

ALFA LAVAL INC.

ALLIED SIGNAL INC.

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT

AMERICAN STEEL & WIRE CORPORATION

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

ASSOCIATED MATERIALS INCORPORATED

BICC CABLES CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC.

CBS CORPORATION

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

COOPER INDUSTRIES INC.

CRANE CO.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

CUTLER-HAMMER INC.

DB RILEY INC.

DELAVAL TURBINE INC.

67 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY DEAN A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BLACKARD EUGENE C. JR. ESQ.

HAMBLETT ROBERT M. ESQ.

CHUSID BRUCE G. ESQ.

DUBRAWSKI PETER A. ESQ.

JACKSON GABRIEL A. ESQ.

HINGLE STEPHANIE A.

GAMBINO MARY ELLEN ESQ.

HOFFMAN JAMES E. ESQ.

HILLYARD MARY KIRK

FADEFF JEFFREY J. ESQ.

BIDERMAN DAVID T. ESQ.

GIFFORD DAVID A. ESQ.

HAKE WILLIAM ESQ.

GILL RAYMOND L. ESQ.

BEACH DAVID F.

COLOMBATTO P. RICHARD ESQ.

GOLDBERG A. SCOTT ESQ.

HAWKINS & PARNELL

GUNNING BRADLEY W.

21 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff); Diane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff); Diane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff); Diane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,130 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2008
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Riley Power, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rapid-American Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff); Diane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND ,ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hyam Cohen (Plaintiff); Diane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA INSULATED WIRE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BICC CABLES CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Materials, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where CUTLER-HAMMER is a litigant