This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 23:46:28 (UTC).

HUNTER STRATTON VS THE ORIGINAL MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN INC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2011 HUNTER STRATTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE ORIGINAL MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ZAVEN V. SINANIAN, EMILIE H. ELIAS, MALCOLM MACKEY, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA, TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0618

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ZAVEN V. SINANIAN

EMILIE H. ELIAS

MALCOLM MACKEY

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STRATTON HUNTER

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MARIA'S HOLDING CORP.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN DOWNTOWN LA INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER EIGHT INC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER NINE INC.

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER SEVEN INC

MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN NUMBER SIX INC.

ORIGINAL MARIA'S ITALIAN KITCHEN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALTZMAN STANLEY D. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

VAN VLECK BRIAN F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (LAB. CODE SECTION 510, 1198); ETC.

4/29/2011: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (LAB. CODE SECTION 510, 1198); ETC.

SUMMONS -

4/29/2011: SUMMONS -

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER, ETC

5/18/2011: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER, ETC

Minute Order -

5/20/2011: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/26/2011: Minute Order -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

Proof of Service -

6/10/2011: Proof of Service -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/10/2011: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2016

DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2013

Docketat 09:00 am in Department 307, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (re status of appeal) - Off Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2012

Docketat 10:00 am in Department 307, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Telephonic Conference - Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2012

DocketDeclaration (of Kiley L. Grombacher in support of stipulation and order re: voluntary dismissal of putative class action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2012

DocketStipulation and Order (RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2012

Docketat 11:30 am in Department 307, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Telephonic Conference ((RE: SETTLEMENT DISCLOSURE; SEEMINUTE ORDER ON BC445579 12/5/12)) - Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2012

DocketNotice (of Court order ); Filed by Attorney for Objector

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2012

Docketat 01:30 pm in Department 307, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2012

DocketProof of Service (stipulation and (proposed) order re: voluntary dismissal of putative class action ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2012

DocketDeclaration (of Kiley L. Grombacher in support of stipulation and order re: voluntary dismissal of putative class action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
06/15/2011

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2011

DocketCCP 170.6 Application Filed; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2011

DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint (CONSOLIDATED ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2011

DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2011

DocketProof of Service (re minute order dated 05-12-11 affidavit of prejudice; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2011

Docketat 03:01 pm in Department 1, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Case is reassigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2011

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2011

DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2011

Docketat 08:30 am in Department 324, Emilie H. Elias, Presiding; Court Order - Court makes order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2011

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less