Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 03:14:52 (UTC).

HUKRIEDE, WILLIAM H. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/15/2012 HUKRIEDE, WILLIAM H - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OROZCO, YOLANDA, MURPHY, DANIEL S., CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S. and GREEN, LESLEY C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4769

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OROZCO, YOLANDA

MURPHY, DANIEL S.

CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S.

GREEN, LESLEY C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUTIERREZ DENISE

Respondents

MUSOLINO CINDY

OFFC OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEES GROUP LIFE INS.

Other

HUKRIEDE DELSY

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUPERIOR COURT

Decedent

HUKRIEDE WILLIAM H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TOPALIAN HRIPSEMA RITA

Other Attorney

CASTLE JAMES CHRISTOPHER

Other Attorneys

BROUSARD JILL ESQ

TOPALIAN H. R.

ABERNETHY TINA M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail or Order Appointing Guardian or Conservator

10/17/2012: Proof of Service by Mail or Order Appointing Guardian or Conservator

Creditors Claim

11/19/2012: Creditors Claim

OTHER - FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE;

12/3/2012: OTHER - FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE;

OTHER - VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSET

2/13/2013: OTHER - VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSET

OTHER - VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETIION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSET

2/13/2013: OTHER - VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO PETIION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSET

Minute Order

7/10/2013: Minute Order

OTHER - NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO COMPEL

7/29/2013: OTHER - NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO COMPEL

Summons (Probate)

11/5/2013: Summons (Probate)

Minute Order

4/2/2014: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/1/2014: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

11/3/2014: Notice - NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

OTHER - PETITIONER RESPONSES TO RESPONDENT

11/7/2014: OTHER - PETITIONER RESPONSES TO RESPONDENT

Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $254.66

11/12/2014: Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $254.66

Minute Order

11/13/2014: Minute Order

Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $127.34

11/14/2014: Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $127.34

Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $254.67

11/14/2014: Civil Deposit - REPORTER'S FEES $254.67

OTHER - APPEAL LETTER

12/28/2015: OTHER - APPEAL LETTER

Proof - Mailing

5/31/2016: Proof - Mailing

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketOrder - Terminating Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DocketProof - Mailing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Orozco, Yolanda, Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketSupplement (1st supplement to petition for termination of proceedings, for discharge of special administrator and for order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (Filed by: Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 2/11/16 Filed by: Clerk )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Docketin Stanley Mosk Dept. - 29, Orozco, Yolanda, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketNotice (NON PAYMENT OF BOND PREMIUM Filed By: SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY, Surety Company )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketBond ($ 280,000.00 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Posted By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketLetters - Special Administrator (Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Docketin Norwalk Dept. - L, Murphy, Daniel S., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Special Administrator (w/Limited Authority Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (of Petitioner, Denise Gutierrez, Trustee of the William H. Hukriede Separate Property Trust, Dated April 2, 2012, in Support of Ex Parte Application for Letters of Special Administration Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (Re: Notice Upon Ex Parte Application for Orders Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (for Letters of Special Administration Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (1st Hearing Date: 12/04/2012 Repres. By: TOPALIAN, H. R., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: GUTIERREZ, DENISE, Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF FEDERAL EMPLOYEE GROUP LIFE INSURANCE (OFEGLI) is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE