This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2016 at 23:25:50 (UTC).

HSIU JEN KUO VS. ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER LP,

Case Summary

On 02/15/2012 HSIU JEN KUO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAN A. PLUIM, HALM, HOWARD L. and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8929

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAN A. PLUIM

HALM, HOWARD L.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUO HSIU JEN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER LP

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

JANSERV GROUP INC.

DBA JANSERV & JANSCAPE

DE LA TORRE ENTERPRISES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

JAN-SERV

ROES 1-20

ROES 1-50

MOES 1-50

JANSCAPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRANOVA ELIA JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

KIRK ZURAWSKI & MEYERS L/O OF

KLINEDINST PC

YOKA & SMITH LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

O'HAGAN THOMAS LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/12/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/12/2013: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S REPLY TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER AND THE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RELATED THE

4/17/2013: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER AND THE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RELATED THE

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE

4/17/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST MEDIATION RETURN DATE, FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERNECE

4/18/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST MEDIATION RETURN DATE, FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERNECE

Minute Order

6/6/2013: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF STACY J. HAIGNEY IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/4/2014: DECLARATION OF STACY J. HAIGNEY IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP

2/4/2014: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP

ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER?S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS PRESENTED IN OPPOSITION TO BCF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/9/2014: ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER?S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS PRESENTED IN OPPOSITION TO BCF?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOIICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON I?I?S CROSS-COMPLAINI AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP

5/2/2014: NOIICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE ON BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON I?I?S CROSS-COMPLAINI AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP

PROOF OF SERVICE

5/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S REPLY TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/15/2014: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC'S REPLY TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF LODGEMENT IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CINTER, LP

5/15/2014: NOTICE OF LODGEMENT IN SUPPORT OF BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CINTER, LP

BURLINCTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S REPLY TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP?S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

5/15/2014: BURLINCTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S REPLY TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP?S RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

6/9/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

ORDER; RULING RE: DEFENDANT BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/23/2014: ORDER; RULING RE: DEFENDANT BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER RE: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S OBJECTIONS TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP?S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/23/2014: ORDER RE: BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC?S OBJECTIONS TO ARCADIA HUB SHOPPING CENTER, LP?S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

8/6/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BURLINGTO COUAT FACTORY OF CALIFORNIA, LLC ON 10/16/12 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (FSC 03/16/15 TRIAL 03/30/15 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (to continue trial and FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Order (ORDER RE BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OBJECTIONS TO AHSC EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Order (ORDER/RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93) ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (CSR # 12608 - KERI A LOGAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • Summons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less