This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:41:19 (UTC).

HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC VS QUAD STAR NUTRITION

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUAD STAR NUTRITION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7796

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC

Defendants

QUAD STAR NUTRITION GROUP LLC

TIN AMELIA

PBM NUTRITIONALS LLC

WESTERN CHINA INVESTMENT CORP.

TIN DAVID

MO JACKIE

CHEUNG YAT HUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKELLY GARRETT

LI BIN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

POON RICKY W. ESQ.

FUNARO II CHARLES W. LAW OFFICES OF

OSBORNE ESQ. CARL K.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

10/19/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/18/2018: Legacy Document

NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Hearing on Motion for New Trial (Motion for New Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Designation of Record on Appeal; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Hearing on Motion for New Trial (Motion for New Trial; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2015
  • Answer; Filed by QUAD STAR NUTRITION GROUP LLC (Defendant); AMELIA TIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Notice; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Notice; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by HORIZON RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less