Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:13:15 (UTC).

HONORIO ALVAREZ VS FERRARI EXPRESS INC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2016 HONORIO ALVAREZ filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against FERRARI EXPRESS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5747

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALVAREZ HONORIO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

FERRARI EXPRESS INC.

FERRARI WORLDWIDE ARMORED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SARA ELIOT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT: LABOR CODE SECTION 206(B) VIOLATION

9/30/2016: COMPLAINT: LABOR CODE SECTION 206(B) VIOLATION

SUMMONS

9/30/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/14/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/30/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/31/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

2/24/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

4/19/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER OF FERRARI EXPRESS, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/17/2017: ANSWER OF FERRARI EXPRESS, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

5/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/17/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/26/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/6/2017: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

6/6/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/28/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

8/3/2017: Minute Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • at 08:00 AM in Department 71; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Honorio Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 71; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Honorio Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT: LABOR CODE SECTION 206(B) VIOLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIOT SARA