This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:06:08 (UTC).

HOMESITE INSURANCE CO VS HOSE-MAN INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 HOMESITE INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HOSE-MAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1079

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOMESITE INSURANCE CO.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

HOSE-MAN INC.

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GRAHAM BRUCE N. ESQ.

GRAHAM & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

WEINSTEIN MARK A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/15/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/15/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/31/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/31/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT

SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT, ETC

2/27/2017: SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT, ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • at 4:30 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • at 04:30 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Answer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Cross-complaint; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • Answer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by HOMESITE INSURANCE CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST MECHANICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOSE-MAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMESITE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINSTEIN MARK A