Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 at 10:19:39 (UTC).

HOLLYE CHAPMAN VS NEAL CHAPMAN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 HOLLYE CHAPMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NEAL CHAPMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GORDON, SCOTT M. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3664

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GORDON, SCOTT M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHAPMAN HOLLEY

Respondent

CHAPMAN NEAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2012
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Final Decl of Dis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • Declaration-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Request-Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less