This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 21:25:19 (UTC).

HIPOLITO SOLANO ET AL VS RUGIERE NELSON GALVEZ MARCUCCI ET A

Case Summary

On 10/15/2013 HIPOLITO SOLANO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUGIERE NELSON GALVEZ MARCUCCI ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT and SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4540

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATANERO MARIA LORENA

CANTON GLORIA SOLANO

MOLINA JOSE

SALDANA PABLO

SOLANO HIPOLITO

Defendants

CASA DE CAMPO FARALLON S.A.

HERNANDEZ CARTER

MARCUCCI RUGIERE NELSON GALVEZ

R. G. IMMOBILAIRE S.A.

R.G. INMOBILIARE S.A.

RG HOTELS INC.

VASQUEZ MARUQUEL GALVEZ

R.G. HOTELS INC.

R.G. IMMOBILIAIRA S.A. C/O GALVEZ Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAMS RICHARD T. ESQ.

HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

AZLIN KRISTINA STARR

Defendant Attorneys

GRAHAM JUSTIN

MICHAEL POOLE ESQ.

CULVER LAW GROUP

MICHAEL POOLE LAW OFFICES OF

POOLE MICHAEL LEWIS

 

Court Documents

STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL

4/2/2018: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL

NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL

5/3/2018: NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUATION OF THE 7/8/19 HEA...) OF 06/27/2019

6/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUATION OF THE 7/8/19 HEA...) OF 06/27/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/23/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON MARUQUEL GALVEZ VASQUEZ

2/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON MARUQUEL GALVEZ VASQUEZ

NOTICE OF RULING CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2014: NOTICE OF RULING CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF MARUQUEL GALVEZ

8/20/2014: DECLARATION OF MARUQUEL GALVEZ

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF MARUQUEL VASQUEZ

10/7/2014: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF MARUQUEL VASQUEZ

Minute Order -

10/17/2014: Minute Order -

NOTJCL OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFENDANT CARTER HERNANDEZ TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT EREOF

6/9/2015: NOTJCL OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFENDANT CARTER HERNANDEZ TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT EREOF

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CARTER HERNANDEZ'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

8/7/2015: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CARTER HERNANDEZ'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Minute Order -

1/11/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/7/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order -

11/2/2016: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF HIPOLITO SOLANO IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

5/4/2017: DECLARATION OF HIPOLITO SOLANO IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

5/4/2017: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DECLARATION OF KRISTINA S. AZLIN

7/14/2017: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DECLARATION OF KRISTINA S. AZLIN

DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF

7/20/2017: DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment - By Default); Filed by Pablo Saldana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment - By Default); Filed by Jose Molina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment - By Default); Filed by Maria Lorena Batanero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment - By Default); Filed by Gloria Solano Canton (Plaintiff); Hipolito Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Maria Lorena Batanero (Plaintiff); Gloria Solano Canton (Plaintiff); Jose Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SAMUEL J. STONE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by Maria Lorena Batanero (Plaintiff); Gloria Solano Canton (Plaintiff); Jose Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
374 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 71; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-10-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Hipolito Solano (Plaintiff); Gloria Solano Canton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hipolito Solano (Plaintiff); Gloria Solano Canton (Plaintiff); Jose Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RICHARD T. WILLIAMS RE: TRANSLATION OF COMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION FOR FRAUD AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR RESCISSION FOR FRAUD AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC524540    Hearing Date: January 07, 2021    Dept: 40

DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP CHECKLIST

(CRC Rule 3.1800)

Case Name: Hipolito Solano v. Rugiere Nelson Galvez Marcucci

Case #: BC524540

Hearing Date: 1/7/21 (OSC Re: entry of default judgment)

Defaulting Party: Defendant Rugiere Nelson Galvez Marcucci; Defendant Maruquel Galvez Vasquez

Total Amount: $1,758,121.05

BACKGROUND: Plaintiffs refinanced their homes to invest in a fraudulent Panamanian real estate investment. Plaintiffs have not received the condominiums they were promised nor has their investment been refunded. Plaintiffs Hipolito and Gloria Solano invested $139,400, while Plaintiffs Pablo Saldana, Jose Molina, Maria Lorena Batanero each invested $50,000.

[X] DEFAULT ENTERED ON: 9/9/19 for Defendants.

[X] MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM CIV-100 SUBMITTED FOR ENTRY OF

COURT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800(a))

[X] SERVICE:

Summons and Complaint

[X] DECLARATION OF MAILING -- Request for Entry of Default to Defendant (CCP § 587)

[X] NO PENDING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

[X] SUMMARY OF CASE PROVIDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(1)) - or other declaration OK [X]

[X] EVIDENTIARY DECLARATIONS/OTHER EVIDENCE (CRC 3.1800(a)(2))

[X] RELIEF PRAYED FOR IN COMPLAINT (same as requested in default?): [X] yes[ ] no

Plaintiffs Hipolito and Gloria Solano

[X] Compensatory: $ 301,308.51

[X] Punitive: $ 415,298.88

[X] Interest: $ 114,913.71

[X] Costs: $ 8,539.62

Total: $ 840,060.72

Plaintiffs Pablo Saldana, Jose Molina, Maria Lorena Batanero (for each)

[X] Compensatory: $108,513.83

[X] Punitive $149,567.04

[X] Interest: $ 41,223.30

[X] Costs: $ 8,539.61

Total: $ 307,843.78

[X] INTEREST COMPUTATIONS (CRC 3.1800(a)(3))

$289,400 (total investment) x 10% = $79.29 per day (38.19 + 13.70 +13.70 +13.70)

From 10-12-2012 to 1-7-202= 3009 days

Plaintiffs Hipolito and Gloria Solano: 3009 x $38.19= $114,913.71

Plaintiffs Pablo Saldana, Jose Molina, Maria Lorena Batanero (for each): 3009 x $13.70= $41,223.30

[n/a] ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION -- Request according to Local Rule 3.214 or reason provided why greater fees should be allowed (CRC 3.1800(b))

[X] MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (CRC 3.1800(a)(4))

[X] STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (CCP § 425.11):

[X] Punitives demanded [X] Evidence of net worth of defendant? (There was evidence that this investment fraud was part of a large scheme in which several individuals were defrauded. (Decl. Azlin, ¶ 18.)

[n/a] DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS?

[X] REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (CRC 3.1800(a)(7))

[n/a] WAS DEFAULTING DEFENDANT A DOE? (CCP § 474) - must do one of the following:

[X] PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT INCLUDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(6))

TENTATIVE RULING: GANTED

Default judgment by Court entered pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 585(d) for Plaintiffs Hipolito and Gloria Solano against Defendants Rugiere Nelson Galvez Marcucci and Maruquel Galvez Vasquez on the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs on 10/15/2013, for damages in the amount of $301,308.51, for punitive damages in the amount of $415,298.88, for interest in the amount of $114,913.71, and for costs in the amount of $8,539.62, for a total amount of $840,060.72.

Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiffs Pablo Saldana, Jose Molina, Maria Lorena Batanero against Defendants Rugiere Nelson Galvez Marcucci and Maruquel Galvez Vasquez on the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs on 10/15/2013, for damages in the amount of $108,513.83, for punitive damages in the amount of $149,567.04, for interest in the amount of $41,223.30, and for costs in the amount of $8,539.61, for a total amount of $307,843.78 for each plaintiff.

Counsel to file a completed Judicial Counsel Form of Judgment, JUD 100, as soon as possible. (CRC 3.1800(a) (5).

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL POOLE ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM JUSTIN