Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 21:51:56 (UTC).

HESHER PRODUCTIONS ETAL VS. INTELLIGENT ENTERTAINMENT ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2009 HESHER PRODUCTIONS ETAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTELLIGENT ENTERTAINMENT ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE A. CONNOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4314

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JACQUELINE A. CONNOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORNER STORE FUND I

HESHER PRODUCTIONS

I CORNER STORE FUND

Defendants

INTELLIGENT ENTERTAINMENT

CHRISTIAN CHARLES

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

FILM FINANCE CORPORATION

COWINGS EVERETT

ABRAHAMS PETER

Not Classified By Court

PASTERNAK CYNTHIA F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DINSMORE & SANDELMANN L.L.P.

EISNER FRANK & KAHAN

Defendant Attorneys

THE SLOAN FIRM P.C.

CUNNINGHAM & TREADWELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department I; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Judgment) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEI, Jacqueline A. Connor, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketSummary; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketAffidavit in Lieu of Testimony; Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketRequest to Enter Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketJudgment (is signed by: JACQUELINE A. CONNOR, JUDGE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
243 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff); CORNER STORE FUND I (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff); CORNER STORE FUND I (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff); CORNER STORE FUND I (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff); CORNER STORE FUND I (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HESHER PRODUCTIONS (Plaintiff); CORNER STORE FUND I (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Film Finances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant