This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 05:22:19 (UTC).

HERNDON PARTNERS LLC VS LEGRAND, INC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2015 HERNDON PARTNERS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEGRAND, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4608

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNDON PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

LEGRAND INC

LEGRAND HOME SYSTEMS INC.

VANTAGE

LEGRAND NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLES J. MALARET

MALARET CHARLES J.

Defendant Attorneys

FISH & RICHARDSON P.C.

FISH & RICHQARDSON PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/29/2016

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Status Conference (Status Conference; Court Makes Order) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/29/2016

Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Status Conference (RE REMOVAL) - Court Makes Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LEGRAND, INC (Defendant); Legrand North America, Inc. (Defendant); Legrand Home Systems, Inc. (Legacy Party) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketNotice; Filed by LEGRAND, INC (Defendant); Legrand North America, Inc. (Defendant); Legrand Home Systems, Inc. (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Legrand North America, Inc. (Defendant); Legrand Home Systems, Inc. (Legacy Party); Vantage (Legacy Party)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketMiscellaneous-Other (UNOPPOSED NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by LEGRAND, INC (Defendant); Legrand North America, Inc. (Defendant); Legrand Home Systems, Inc. (Legacy Party) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2016

DocketNotice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2015

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court Makes Order) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
11/04/2015

DocketNotice; Filed by LEGRAND, INC (Defendant); Legrand North America, Inc. (Defendant); Legrand Home Systems, Inc. (Legacy Party) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2015

DocketNotice (OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2015

DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by HERNDON PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2015

DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2015

DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2015

DocketSummons; Filed by HERNDON PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2015

DocketSummons; Filed by HERNDON PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2015

DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2015

DocketComplaint Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2015

DocketComplaint; Filed by HERNDON PARTNERS, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less