This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2019 at 07:53:38 (UTC).

HERBERT G. NEEDMAN VS LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D. EPPS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 HERBERT G NEEDMAN filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D EPPS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5971

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NEEDMAN HERBERT G.

Defendants and Respondents

CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.

CITIGROUP INVESTMENTS INC.

CITIGROUP MANAGEMENT CORP.

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D. EPPS INC.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT-UNLIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RONALD P. SLATES A PROFESSIONAL CORP

Defendant Attorneys

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO L.C.

LEGITTINO TRICIA L.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

2/11/2014: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/11/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

3/7/2014: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK, N.A. AND CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. FOR INTERPLEADER

3/11/2014: VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK, N.A. AND CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INC. FOR INTERPLEADER

DECLARATION OF BERNARD REINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CITIGROUP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HERBERT G. NEEDMAN'S APPLICATION FOR INTERIM ORDER DIRECTING CITIBANK TO TRANSFER NEEDMAN'S FUNDS ORIGINALLY D

3/11/2014: DECLARATION OF BERNARD REINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CITIGROUP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HERBERT G. NEEDMAN'S APPLICATION FOR INTERIM ORDER DIRECTING CITIBANK TO TRANSFER NEEDMAN'S FUNDS ORIGINALLY D

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/21/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/24/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/24/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/21/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/5/2014: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CITIBANK,, NA. AND CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS. INC. TO DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH COURT PURSUANT TO INTERPLEADER CAUSE OF ACTION ALL

5/6/2014: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CITIBANK,, NA. AND CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS. INC. TO DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH COURT PURSUANT TO INTERPLEADER CAUSE OF ACTION ALL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/7/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMP

5/12/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMENDED COMP

UDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

5/21/2014: UDGMENT ON STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMEND

6/9/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 1ST AMEND

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/9/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

BRIEF STATEMENT OF CLAIMS AND PARTIES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; DECLARATIONS OF HERBERT G. NEEDMAN AND RONALD P. SLATES IN SUPPORT THEREOF LC.C.P. ? 585

10/3/2014: BRIEF STATEMENT OF CLAIMS AND PARTIES IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; DECLARATIONS OF HERBERT G. NEEDMAN AND RONALD P. SLATES IN SUPPORT THEREOF LC.C.P. ? 585

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/17/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Herbert G. Needman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS DEPOSITED IN INTERPLEADER AND CURRENTLY HELD BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Statement of the Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Herbert G. Needman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL -RECLASSIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Notice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

® ORIGINAL ©

Tricia L. Legittino (State Bar No. 254311) Yosi orlf:lIJnEof%alifornia tlegittino@frandzel.com A /@&,mty of Los Angeles Damon Rubin (State Bar No. 186504) | '

drubin@frandzel.com MAY 21 2014

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO, L.C. | . : 6500 Wilshire Boulevard Sherri R. Cangr, Bxecutive Officer/Clerk Seventeenth Floor By___%— Depuly Los Angeles, California 90048-4920 E. Vermer .

Telephone: (323) 852-1000 Facsimile: (323) 651-2577

Attorneys for defendants and cross-Complainants, Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT HERBERT G. NEEDMAN, an individual, CASE No. BC535971

Plaintiff,

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

Action Filed: February 11,2014

Defendants.

A0 -~

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D. EPPS, INC. \ mELOm aka LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D. EPPS, A a5 PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, a cocomasa W California corporation; JOSEPH D. EPPS aka 2 f% % ST S ¥ JOSEPH DONALD EPPS, JR., an individual, e m T TIFFANY HATHAWAY-EPPS, an - S8 8 individual; and ROES 1 through 100, DR E inclusive, T o L b =:'"' = ’-:' ::' i § sEaE8 &