This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:31:42 (UTC).

HERACH DANLYAN VS JEFFREY HAROLD FEINSTEIN

Case Summary

On 07/22/2016 HERACH DANLYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY HAROLD FEINSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7073

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DANLYAN HERACH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

FEINSTEIN JEFFREY HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOGHTADER MICHAEL H. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SANTA CRUZ BROWNWOOD & CANNON

MILLER WEYD-ANNE N.

 

Court Documents

Summons

7/22/2016: Summons

CoverSheet

7/22/2016: CoverSheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

3/7/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/22/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

10/5/2017: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ORDER

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/9/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT'S (PROPOSED) JOINT WITNESS LIST

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S (PROPOSED) JOINT WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE

JURY INSTRUCTIONS

4/26/2018: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE ANY EXPERTS NOT PROPERLY DESIGNATED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WEYD-ANNE MILLER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE ANY EXPERTS NOT PROPERLY DESIGNATED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WEYD-ANNE MILLER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM AND CAUTIONED REGARDING PROVIDING EXPERT MKDICAL TESTIMONY; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM AND CAUTIONED REGARDING PROVIDING EXPERT MKDICAL TESTIMONY; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO USE HEALTH INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WEYDANNE MILLER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO USE HEALTH INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WEYDANNE MILLER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES, AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY RESPONSES;MEEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, WITNESSES, AND DOCUMENTS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY RESPONSES;MEEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order

5/1/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/15/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/30/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Herach Danlyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Herach Danlyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 ADMISSIBILITY OF PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO USE HEALTH INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF WEYDANNE MILLER; [PROPOSED] ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • General Denial; Filed by Jeffrey Harold Feinstein (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Jeffrey Harold Feinstein (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Jeffrey Harold Feinstein (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Herach Danlyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER WEYD-ANNE N.