Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 01:06:27 (UTC).

HENRY MARTINEZ ET AL VS INAMEHK ENTERPRISE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2010 HENRY MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against INAMEHK ENTERPRISE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU, RONALD M. SOHIGIAN, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE, ELIHU M. BERLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3226

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

RONALD M. SOHIGIAN

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

ELIHU M. BERLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGANA CARLOS

MARTINEZ HENRY

SANTANA JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

INAMEHK ENTEPRISE INC.

INAMEHK ENTERPRISE INC.

WIENERSHNITZEL NO. 338

Not Classified By Court

THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF WIENERS 363 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINK KEITH A. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • Hearing02/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of the Examination of Patrick O'Neill on behalf of Third-Party Wieners #363 LLC); Filed by Carlos Magana (Plaintiff); Henry Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Santana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (of Patrick O'Neill) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (of Patrick O'Neill) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (of Patrick O'Neill) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Continuance of The Examination of Patrick O'Neill on Behalf of Third-Party Weiners #363 LLC); Filed by Carlos Magana (Plaintiff); Henry Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Santana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docketat 11:13 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 Case;) of 06/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 58; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2010-03-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION OF ASSIGNED JUDGE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 170.6, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carlos Magana (Plaintiff); Henry Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Santana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC433226    Hearing Date: August 24, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

martha williams, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

bryan b. kim, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 433226

Hearing Date:

August 24, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Assignee of Record Fidelity National Title Ins. Co. (“Fidelity) applies for an order for appearance and examination of Ward Hanigan, the managing member and agent for Defendant and Judgment Debtor Financial Fitness, LLC, individually, and as trustee of the Mansfield 1760 Trust. The Court notes that Fidelity failed to attach a copy of the judgment to the application. (LASC Rule 3.221(a).) Therefore, the application is denied without prejudice.

DATED: August 24, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINK KEITH A. ESQ.