This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 21:56:53 (UTC).

HENRI WASSILIAN VS. L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2008 HENRI WASSILIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against L A FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4251

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASSILIAN HENRI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

APEX SPORTING GOODS INC

SAUNATEC INC.

L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC

APEX SAUNAS AND WINE CELLARS

OY HELO

Cross Defendants and Defendants

SAUNATEC INC.

R.W. ELECTRIC INC.

HELO

SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP

OY HELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUTLER TERRENCE L.

BYBERG GREGORY

Defendant Attorneys

YOKA & SMITH LLP

LAW OFFICES OF CHO & BROWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2012
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Trial Resumes) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Trial Resumes) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Trial Resumes) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Docketat 08:40 AM in Department F49; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Jury Sworn) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DocketOpposition; Filed by HENRI WASSILIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by HENRI WASSILIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F46; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Held, Not Settled-Conf & Trial Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by HENRI WASSILIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by HENRI WASSILIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by L.A. FITNESS INTERNATIONAL LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by HENRI WASSILIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less