This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2016 at 22:51:14 (UTC).

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD VS. DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 HENNELLY GROSSFELD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, CESAR C. SARMIENTO, GERALD ROSENBERG and H. CHESTER HORN, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4696

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

CESAR C. SARMIENTO

GERALD ROSENBERG

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD

KING MICHAEL G.

MARTIN PAUL

Defendants

DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP

DIGITAL COMPLIANCE INC.

HASSEN KENNETH

LUU JACK

PRO PATCH INC.

ROSALES MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING MICHAEL G.

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A. LUCAL

GHILEZAN R. MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2015
  • Notice-Settlement (and stay order re related actions ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Declaration (R. Michael Ghilezan ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Opposition (MOTION TO LIFT STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Motion (TO LIFT STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF TRIAL SETTING AND STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF TRIAL AND STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Objection Document Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2012
  • Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Stipulation and Order (SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANT DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP, INC. CONFORMED COPY W/BUCK SLIP) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Request for Entry of Default (AGAINST DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP, A CALIF. CORP. ENTERED) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • Request for Entry of Default (Against: Digital Compliance Group /received/ Name of the defendant does not Conform with the complaint & Summo No Rej Ntc sent out) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • Notice-Related Cases Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENNELLY & GROSSFELD LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGITAL COMPLIANCE GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHILEZAN R. MICHAEL