This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2016 at 22:15:43 (UTC).

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD VS. DAVID ASH

Case Summary

On 01/28/2011 HENNELLY GROSSFELD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID ASH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, ALLAN J. GOODMAN, GERALD ROSENBERG and H. CHESTER HORN, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1256

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

GERALD ROSENBERG

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD

KING MICHAEL G.

MARTIN PAUL T.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ASH DAVID

ORLANDO CABANDAY

DAVID ASH TRUST

Other

MERINO YEBRI LLP

Trustee

POKORNY AURENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING MICHAEL G.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE GREGORY E.

TORJESEN JOHN C.

PUMILIA PATEL & ADAMEC LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/20/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEFT'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Demurrer (TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Notice-Settlement (and stay order re related actions ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 AURENE POKORNY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID ASH TRUST,1-10-08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Notice (OF DEATH OF DAVID ASH ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Motion (TO LIFT STAY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF TRIAL SETTING AND STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2011
  • Notice-Related Cases (RE SC111953; SC111228; SC114696 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory (170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Notice-Related Cases ( REL/W - SC110953) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • Notice of Stay (OF PROCEEDINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENNELLY & GROSSFELD LLP is a litigant