This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 12:04:17 (UTC).

HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CAL., LLC VS ARJOHUNTLEIGH

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CAL , LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARJOHUNTLEIGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5267

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CAL. LLC

Defendant

ARJOHUNTLEIGH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons

1/19/2016: Summons

Complaint

1/19/2016: Complaint

Unknown

3/7/2016: Unknown

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

5/14/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Judgment) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT STATUS) - Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-09-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial ( WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOES 1-10 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Default Judgment ( TOTAL $92,741.46 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request to Enter Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default (AS TO: ARJOHUNTLEIGH, INC. - RECEIVED; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Default Entered (AS TO: ARJOHUNTLEIGH, INC - ENTERED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Healthcare Ally Management of Cal., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC125267    Hearing Date: February 11, 2020    Dept: P

 

Tentative Ruling

Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. Arjohuntleigh, Inc., Case No. SC125267

Hearing Date February 11, 2020

Plaintiff’s Motion for Reconsideration or Clarification of Order on Motion to Set Aside Default

Analysis/Background

On December 30, 2019 this court issued an order setting aside defendant’s default, finding the three factors of Rappleyea v. Campbell (a meritorious defense, a satisfactory excuse, and diligence in seeking to set aside the default) had been fulfilled. Plaintiff now moves for reconsideration or clarification of that order.

The court will not reconsider its prior order, because no “new or different facts, circumstances, or law” have been presented. Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §1008. The court will, however, clarify the nature of the “extrinsic mistake” that provided the basis for the December order. The “extrinsic mistake” was Brzecezk’s failure to make the corporate defendant’s management aware that he had been served with the lawsuit. See 12/30/2019 Minute Order at pg. 2. The court denies defendant’s request for monetary sanctions, as plaintiff did not act in bad faith by bringing this motion.