This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 20:13:56 (UTC).

HB PARKCO CONTRUCTION,INC. VS. SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEG

Case Summary

On 07/10/2013 HB PARKCO CONTRUCTION,INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN and NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0996

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendant

SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAMINE & UNGERER

SALAMONE MARY A.

Defendant Attorney

CARPENTER ROTHANS DUMONT & DOUMANIAN

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/7/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • Request for Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Notice (NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL 3-10-16 8:30 AM DEPT P ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Notice (NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL 2-8-16 8:30 AM DEPT P ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Stipulation (TO TAKE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTD TO 12-8-15 8:30 AM DEPT P ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • Demurrer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO 7/29/14 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE "BY FAX" ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant