Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 02:38:09 (UTC).

HAVID CAVILLO VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2013 HAVID CAVILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, ROGER ITO, TERESA A. BEAUDET, LORI ANN FOURNIER, TORRIBIO, JOHN A. and RAUL A. SAHAGUN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1258

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

ROGER ITO

TERESA A. BEAUDET

LORI ANN FOURNIER

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

BRAVO SPORTS

BRAVO SPORTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100

DOES 1-100

SALAZAR ELEAZAR CAMACHO

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A

GARCIA ESTELA CAMACHO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A

Minors

CAVILLO HAVID

CAVILLO HAVID A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS

Guardian Ad Litem

CAVILLO WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MARGOLIS CARLA

ACKER & WHIPPLE

HARMAN KELLEY E.

CIRUCCI PATRICIA A. ESQ.

CARLA M. BLANC

Minor Attorneys

SPELL SCOTT E. LAW OFFICE OF

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT E. SPELL A.P.C.

Other Attorneys

SPELL SCOTT E. - LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ? CIVIL

12/20/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ? CIVIL

SUMMONS -

12/27/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING COPIES OF PICTURES, VIDEOS, AND RADIOLOGICAL STUDIES OF POSTMORTEM EXAMINATION AND AUTOPSY OF DECEDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIO

1/6/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING COPIES OF PICTURES, VIDEOS, AND RADIOLOGICAL STUDIES OF POSTMORTEM EXAMINATION AND AUTOPSY OF DECEDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIO

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING COPIES OF PICTURES, VIDEOS AND RADIOLOGICAL STUDIES OF POSTMORTEM EXAMINATION AND AUTOPSY OF DECEDENT

2/3/2014: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING COPIES OF PICTURES, VIDEOS AND RADIOLOGICAL STUDIES OF POSTMORTEM EXAMINATION AND AUTOPSY OF DECEDENT

Minute Order -

2/3/2014: Minute Order -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

12/10/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/12/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/13/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/5/2015: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

2/5/2015: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE; ETC.

3/19/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE; ETC.

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING MARCH 23, 2015 HEARING DATE).

3/23/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING MARCH 23, 2015 HEARING DATE).

Minute Order -

3/23/2015: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/12/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF RULING ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

7/31/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

9/30/2015: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S ANSWER TO BRAVO SPORTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/8/2016: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY'S ANSWER TO BRAVO SPORTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AND DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by WENDY CAVILLO (Legacy Party); CAVILLO, HAVID A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING DISMISSALC/F 01/29/17 & 2/24/17) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Correction (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; NEED 2ND PAGE; NEED SAC IDENTIFIED AS OPERATIVE COMPL. NEED DATE BY SIGNATURE; ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Correction (RFD RETURNED; NEED SAC DESIGNATED AND DEFT. SOUTHERN CA. EDISON PREVAILED ON MSJ. CANNOT DISMISS THEM; NEED TO DISM. REMAINING DEFTS. ON SAC; ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department G; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department G, Torribio, John A., Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2013
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bravo Companies Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPELL SCOTT E.