This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2016 at 05:08:32 (UTC).

HARVEY MALONE VS GEM HEALTHCARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/04/2013 HARVEY MALONE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEM HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0760

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALONE HARVEY

Defendants

GEM HEALTHCARE LLC

GEM TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN JAMES M.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Notice of Filing (CORRECT PROOFS OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Notice (OF ERRARA RE: CAPTIONS TO DEFEN- DANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (RE: GEM HEALTHCARE, LLC, DBA GEM TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER BY SERVING GRACE SANDY MERCADO, A/A ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Notice (of OSC re trial court delay reduction ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Declaration (of Genivee Malone ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEM TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where GEM HEALTHCARE LLC DBA GEM TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER is a litigant