Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 12:43:20 (UTC).

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS RENEE SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/22/2013 HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENEE SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3103

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORP.

Defendants

SMITH RENEE AN INDIVIDUAL

SMITH RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Enforce Settlement

3/4/2020: Motion to Enforce Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)

Order - ORDER / RULING (HEARING HELD 9-9-20)

9/9/2020: Order - ORDER / RULING (HEARING HELD 9-9-20)

Notice of Ruling

9/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

11/20/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/15/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment ([PROPOSED] JUDGMENT); Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder (/ Ruling (Hearing held 9-9-20)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (CONTINUANCE MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT); Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:16 AM in Department C; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO RENEE SMITH; BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 7/2/13 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC063103    Hearing Date: September 09, 2020    Dept: C

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SMITH

CASE NO.:  VC063103

HEARING 9/9/20

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#8

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company’s motion to vacate dismissal, enforce settlement and enter judgment against Defendants is GRANTED.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Plaintiff Harco National Insurance Company moves to enter judgment pursuant to CCP § 664.6.

If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement. (CCP § 664.6.) The agreement must be sufficiently definite to enable courts to give it an exact meaning. If an essential element is reserved for future agreement, it is not sufficiently definite. (See Weddington Productions, Inc. v. Flick (1998) 60 Cal.App.4th 793, 810-812.) The Court is authorized to enter judgment pursuant to the terms of a settlement agreement that is orally stipulated to before the Court. (Estate of Dipinto (1986) 188 Cal.App.3d 625.)

The parties entered into a settlement pursuant to a Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Installment Payments. Defendants agreed to pay the sum of $67,135.99 in installments commencing on 11/15/13. If Defendants default, Plaintiff may cause the stipulation to be filed with the court for the full amount then owing, less credit for all payments made prior to default, plus any additional court costs. (Stipulation, ¶ 5.)

Defendant has made payments totaling $14,900.00, and failed to make any of the payments due thereafter. The unpaid principal is $52,235.99. Cort costs total $478.00. (Tapper Decl., ¶ 6.)

Accordingly, pursuant to the terms of settlement, Plaintiff is entitled to a judgment of $67,613.99.

The court declines to award pre-judgment interest because the settlement provided for a judgment for the “full amount then owing.” Pre-judgment interest was not contemplated in the settlement.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED.

Dismissal is set aside, and judgment against Defendants is entered in the sum of $67,613.99.