Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 01:42:09 (UTC).

HANNIBAL INC VS BAC FILMS

Case Summary

On 09/02/2010 HANNIBAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAC FILMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. SOLNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4824

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. SOLNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HANNIBAL INC.

HANNIBAL PICTURES

Defendants

BAC FILMS

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

FILMS BAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAU ROBERT M.

Defendant Attorneys

LAWRENCE Y. ISER

ISER LAWRENCE Y.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BAC FILMS TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/7/2011: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BAC FILMS TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND TO FILE ANSWER

4/7/2011: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND TO FILE ANSWER

NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN

4/15/2011: NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN

Minute Order -

4/20/2011: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/24/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hannibal, Inc. (Plaintiff); Hannibal Pictures (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT BAC FILMS TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND TO FILE ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bac Films (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ROBERT M. NAU IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hannibal, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE Y. ISER