This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 17:09:42 (UTC).

HANDIAN CORPORATION VS. THE BRASS LAMP BAR CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2016 HANDIAN CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE BRASS LAMP BAR CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0537

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANDIAN CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

NANCI SCHNEIDER

JULIE SCHNEIDER

THE MARK SCHNEIDER TRUST NO. 1

MICHAEL SCHNEIDER

MARK SCHNEIDER AS TRUSTEE AND AN INDIV.

DANA SCHNEIDER

THE BRASS LAMP BAR CORP.

SCHNEIDER MICHAEL

MICHAEL W BINNING LAW OFFICE OF

SCHNEIDER NANCI

SCHNEIDER DANA

SCHNEIDER JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALEK LAW FIRM (KEITH SALEK)

SALEK SALEK LAW FIRM KEITH

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W BINNING LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • Writ of Execution -Attachment 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Writ filed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Writ filed; Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Writ filed (WRIT OF EXECUTION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF HANDIAN CORPORATION AGAINST BRASS LAMP CORP AND SAMANTHA ARGOSINO; JDMNT $67,643.94; INT. $796.90; FEE $25; TOTAL$68,4650.84;M/T ATTY-K. SALEK); Filed by ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by HANDIAN CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs (DECL. OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $796.90 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY ORDER ON PLTNFS MTN TO ENFORCE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT AND STIP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP, ETC. P.S. MARK SCHNEIDER, TRUSTEE AND A N INDIV. SUB SERVED DANA SCHNEIDER, PIC 3-2 9-16 + DECL OF DILL + DECL OFMAIL); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP , ETC. P.S. MARK SCHNEIDER TRUSTO NO 1 TO SERVE MARK SCHNEIDER -TRUSTEE SUB SERVED DANA SCHNEIDER, PIC 3-29-16 + DECL OF DILL + DECL OF MAIL); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, COMP ET AL P.S. THE BRASS LAMP BAR CORP TO SERVE; SAMANTHA ARGOSINO-AGENT SUB SERVED PRICILLA PELONIS- OCCUP ANT, PIC, 3-29-16 + DECL OF DILL + DECL MAIL); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S. SUMMONS, CMP, ETC. P.S. MICAHEL SCHNEIDER INDIV. SUB SERVED DANA SCHENIDER, PIC ON 3-29-16 + DECL OF DILL + DECL OF MAIL); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by HANDIAN CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Notice of Pending Action (Notice of Pendency Action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by HANDIAN CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Summons; Filed by HANDIAN CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less