Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2016 at 09:09:57 (UTC).

HAMPAR MEHTERIAN, ET AL. VS CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 HAMPAR MEHTERIAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN, JAMES A. STEELE, MICHAEL HARWIN, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4331

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. MACLAUGHLIN

JAMES A. STEELE

MICHAEL HARWIN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEHTERIAN YVONNE

MEHTERIAN HAMPAR

Defendants

CORBIN AND SHERMAN WAY PARTNERS

WILSON DAVID

CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO.

DOES 1 TO 20

BONANOMI ROBERT

BONANOMI EVE

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO. INC.

Cross Defendants

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO.

HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO. INC.

Other

LAW OFFICES OF GILCHRIST & RUTTER APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOM TRACEY P.

Defendant Attorney

BERMAN CRAIG STEVEN

Other Attorneys

TOMASSIAN SERGE .

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/8/2013: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS HAMPAR AND YVONNE MEHTERIAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHTERIAN. TRUST, FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE AS LONG CAUSE MATTER; MEMORANDUM

1/9/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS HAMPAR AND YVONNE MEHTERIAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHTERIAN. TRUST, FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE AS LONG CAUSE MATTER; MEMORANDUM

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS HAMPAR AND YVONNE MEHTERIAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHTERIAN TRUST, FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE AS LONG CAUSE MATTER; MEMORANDUM

1/9/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS HAMPAR AND YVONNE MEHTERIAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE MEHTERIAN TRUST, FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE AS LONG CAUSE MATTER; MEMORANDUM

Minute Order

3/1/2013: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC. TO SEEK REOPENING OF DISCOVERY;

4/10/2013: PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC. TO SEEK REOPENING OF DISCOVERY;

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING REOPENING OF ENVIRONNTAL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS AND DEPOSITION OF ADNAN SIDDIQUI OR IN THE ALTERNATRVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME; DECLARATION OF TALIN GRIG

4/10/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING REOPENING OF ENVIRONNTAL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS AND DEPOSITION OF ADNAN SIDDIQUI OR IN THE ALTERNATRVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME; DECLARATION OF TALIN GRIG

NOTICE OF RULING RE EXPARTE APPLICATION OF HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE, INC. TO REOPEN DISCOVERY

4/12/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE EXPARTE APPLICATION OF HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE, INC. TO REOPEN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE TO JUNE 3, 2013

5/14/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE TO JUNE 3, 2013

MINUTES

6/17/2013: MINUTES

MINUTES

6/20/2013: MINUTES

NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER ON HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, CO. INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/23/2013: NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER ON HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, CO. INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

7/24/2013: Minute Order

ORDER ON DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/24/2013: ORDER ON DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

7/24/2013: Minute Order

ORDER ON DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/24/2013: ORDER ON DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON HYN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, CO. INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/26/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON HYN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, CO. INC.?S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

5/7/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/4/2014: Minute Order

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2014
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Declaration (OF TRACEY P. HOM RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • Notice (of osc re: dismissal ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (as to Caspar Management Only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (as to HVN Environmental Only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Order (ON DEFENDANT HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CO., INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Notice (OF FILING OF AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER ON HVN ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, CO. INC'S APPLECATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (re: 7-24-13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Notice-Settlement (application for determination of good faith settlement ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • Objection Document (TO PLFS NOTICE OF RULING RE TRIAL STATUS CONFERENCE HELD JUNE 17, 2013 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • Notice-Continuance Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • Motion-Strike Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • Acknowledgement-Receipt Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Summons-Issued Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERGE TOMASSIAN ESQ.