Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2016 at 14:05:14 (UTC).

HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING, INC. VS. CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2008 HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY THORNTON HOUSE and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7028

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY THORNTON HOUSE

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FUATALA TOAETOLU (DOE 6)

BINU VAIDYAN (DOE 7)

CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

ROBERTO MUNOZ (DOE 3)

DEBRA MCCURRY (DOE 9)

MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC

AKIKO KOMORI (DOE 4)

BENNETTE TOAETOLU (DOE 5)

LEE STIFF (DOE 10)

Cross Defendants

HO KOK H.

CHEN JOHNNY Y.

HIGDON LORI

CHOPRA SABINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINOOFAR PEDRAM

Defendant Attorneys

BARRY GARDNER & KINCANNON

CAMPBELL ROBERT G.

COTTONE EDWIN R.

Cross Defendant Attorney

HERNANDEZ JESSE S.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2008: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/18/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/29/2008: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/30/2008: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST -CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

6/5/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST -CLASS MAIL-CIVIL

Minute Order

6/10/2008: Minute Order

HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING , INC.S ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/11/2008: HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING , INC.S ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF OSC RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

6/11/2008: NOTICE OF OSC RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/30/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/30/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/30/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/30/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/30/2008: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

CROSS-DEFENDANT SABINA CHOPRAS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/16/2008: CROSS-DEFENDANT SABINA CHOPRAS ANSWER TO CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/6/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/6/2008: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/22/2008: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

10/3/2008: Minute Order

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2009
  • Notice (OF X-DEFTS' WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • Notice of Continuance (FOR MTN TO TAX COSTS FILED BY HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Motion to Tax Costs (BY HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Request for Judicial Notice (BY HAITBRINK ASPHALT PAVING, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs ($2,560.00 MOT. TO TAX COSTS 4/9/09 D 17 MEMO TO DEPT. 17 3/13/09 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 5/23/08 WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons (LINDA ELLIS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2008
  • Opposition (TO PLTFF'S MTN FOR STAY OF ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • Notice of Motion (MTN FOR STAY OF ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons (COMPLAINT,CCC SHEET, ADDENDUM, STATEMENT OF LOCATION; SERVED: MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 4-10-08 AT 2:15 PM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PERSON SERVED: RANDALL HALE BY SERVING LINDA DORMAN ON 4/4/08 AT 3:45 PM) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANCHESTER & BELFORD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CULP CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Haitbrink Asphalt Paving Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINOOFAR PEDRAM