This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 at 09:11:29 (UTC).

HAGGAR, PAUL JOHN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/21/2012 HAGGAR, PAUL JOHN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GOETZ, REVA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3727

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GOETZ, REVA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HELLIE KENNETH KERMIT

Not Classified By Court

GEORGE WILLIAM

SUPERIOR COURT

Decedent

HAGGAR PAUL JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORAVEC LINDA K. ESQ

MORAVEC HENRY J. III ESQ

MOONEY F. BENTLEY JR. ESQ

VARGA LINDA M. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/23/2013

in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Not Held - Motion Off-Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2013

TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2013

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2013

Receipt (Filed by: Attorney for Administrator )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2013

Order - Approving Account (Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2013

in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2013

Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

Accounting (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 06/10/2013 Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Varga,Linda M.,Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2012

Certificate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2012

Inventory & Appraisal ($293,300.00 Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/29/2012

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2012

Request (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2012

Letters (Limited Authority Filed by: Attorney for Executor Issued To:: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2012

Order - Appointing Personal Representative (Limited Authority NO BOND Filed by: Attorney for Executor Executor: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2012

in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding; Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2012

Supplement (TO PETITION FOR PROBATE, ETC. Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2012

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2012

Notice - Hearing (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2012

in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 9, Goetz, Reva, Presiding; Appoint Probate of Will Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2012

Petition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 04/23/2012 Filed By: Hellie, Kenneth Kermit, Petitioner Repres By: Mooney, F. Bentley, Jr., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Henry J. III, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Moravec, Linda K., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less