This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 21:43:45 (UTC).

GUY HART VS. SAM PINCHASSI, ET.AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 GUY HART filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SAM PINCHASSI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, RALPH C. HOFER and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5414

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

RALPH C. HOFER

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HART SARA

HART GUY

Defendants

PINCHASSI EYAL

PINCHASSI SAM

Not Classified By Court

DAVID L. FLECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAGHZO ARMEN

D'ATTARAY MAINAK

DAVID L. FLECK INC. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

MANGLINONG ALEXANDER PALAYLAY

RUSH GERALD EDWIN

SANDERS ROBERTS & JEWETT LLP

ZIVEN JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

7/13/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order -

2/15/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - *STATUS OF STAY*)

8/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - *STATUS OF STAY*)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - *STATUS OF STAY*) OF 08/28/2019

8/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - *STATUS OF STAY*) OF 08/28/2019

Response - RESPONSE OF DEFENDANTS SAM PINCHASSI AND EYAL PINCHASSI TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, AND DISMISSAL

11/12/2019: Response - RESPONSE OF DEFENDANTS SAM PINCHASSI AND EYAL PINCHASSI TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, AND DISMISSAL

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/13/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/13/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/13/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/13/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF THE CURRENT STATUS OF THE CASE

11/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF THE CURRENT STATUS OF THE CASE

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 09:15 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (- *matter still stayed? July 2020*) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (- *matter still stayed? July 2020*) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Continuance fo Hearing Date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on Ex...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder (staying case per appeal); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by GUY HART (Plaintiff); SARA HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by GUY HART (Plaintiff); SARA HART (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIALCOURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT) - Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-08-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC065414    Hearing Date: July 14, 2020    Dept: 36

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 36

SARA HART, an individual; GUY HART, an individual,

Plaintiff,

v.

SAM PINCHASSI, an individual; EYAL PINCHASSI, an individual, and as Trustee of The MOLLY P. FAMILY TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 5, 2008; and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive,

Defendants.

Case No.: EC065414

Hearing Date: 7/14/2020

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE: DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Proceedings in this action are stayed pending resolution of the appeal in Hart, et al. v. Hart, et al. (Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC519025).

Stay of Proceedings

Defendants demur to the Complaint in this action in part on grounds of the doctrine of primary rights and plea in abatement with respect to the related case Hart, et al. v. Hart, et al. (Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC519025). Judgment was entered in that action on May 15, 2018. Following a denied Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Appeal on July 12, 2018, appealing the Judgment. The appeal has not yet been resolved.

On consideration that several of the issues in this action, and in particular the applicability of a plea in abatement and primary rights doctrine in this motion, are likely to be resolved by the pending appeal, the court orders the instant proceedings stayed, pending resolution of the appeal in Hart, et al. v. Hart, et al. (Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. BC519025).

Dated: ____________________________

Gregory Alarcon

Superior Court Judge

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAGHZO ARMEN .

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK