This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 03:32:59 (UTC).

GUSTAVO TRUJILLO HERNANDEZ VS IGT CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 GUSTAVO TRUJILLO HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against IGT CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, ELIHU M. BERLE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0341

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ GUSTAVO TRUJILLO

Defendants and Respondents

IGT CONSTRUCTION INC

WEST COAST CONSTRUCTION

DOES 1-100

IGT CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA WEST COAST CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HAINES PAUL K.

HAINES LAW GROUP APC

HAINES PAUL KEITH

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

 

Court Documents

Status Report

3/2/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

3/9/2018: Minute Order

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/19/2018: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Other -

5/1/2018: Other -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/2/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

11/9/2018: Declaration

Declaration

11/9/2018: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/9/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service by Mail

11/14/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

12/10/2018: Unknown

Notice

3/21/2019: Notice

Unknown

4/4/2019: Unknown

Statement of Decision

11/18/2016: Statement of Decision

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1/6/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/1/2017: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order

7/19/2017: Order

Answer

10/16/2017: Answer

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 04/04/2019 entered for Plaintiff Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez against Defendant IGT Construction, Inc., a California corporation DBA West Coast Construction.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Order Granting Plaintiff Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez's Request for Dismissal of Class and Representative Claims Without Prejudice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice (of Court Setting Non-Appearance Case Review re Entry of Default Judgment); Filed by Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Request Ent of Def)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Request Ent of Def) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 323; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Statement of Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: (1) FAILURE TO PAY ALL OVERTIME WAGES (LABOR CODE 204, 510, 558, 1194 AND 1198); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Gustavo Trujillo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less