This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:46:18 (UTC).

GUSTAVO RAMIREZ VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 GUSTAVO RAMIREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1562

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ GUSTAVO

Defendants and Respondents

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MIKHOV STEVEN B. ESQ.

MIKHOV STEVE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Notice

11/14/2018: Notice

SUMMONS

8/24/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

11/29/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/30/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

12/13/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/15/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

5/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

5/24/2017: Unknown

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC.

6/5/2017: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

6/12/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

7/28/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/14/2017: Minute Order

ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER

8/14/2017: ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/24/2017: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order

11/7/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2017: Minute Order

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal Following Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Notice (of Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Gustavo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Gustavo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gustavo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gustavo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRAITY - VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Gustavo Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC631562    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 74

BC631562 GUSTAVO RAMIREZ VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Plaintiff’s Motion for Attorney Fees

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted in part. Attorney fees of $11,876 are awarded to plaintiff.

Lodestar

The court has reviewed the records submitted with the motion, and determines that a reasonable award is $11,876.

Multiplier

Plaintiff requests a multiplier of .5. “The award of a multiplier is in the end a discretionary matter largely left to the trial court.” (Hogar v. Community Development Com'n of City of Escondido (2007) 157 Cal.App.4th 1358, 1371.) “[T]he trial court is not required to include a fee enhancement for exceptional skill, novelty of the questions involved, or other factors. Rather, applying a multiplier is discretionary.” (Rey v. Madera Unif. Sch. Dist. (2012) 203 Cal.App.4th 1223, 1242.)

“A trial court should award a multiplier for exceptional representation only when the quality of representation far exceeds the quality of representation that would have been provided by an attorney of comparable skill and experience billing at the hourly rate used in the lodestar calculation. Otherwise, the fee award will result in unfair double counting and be unreasonable. Nor should a fee enhancement be imposed for the purpose of punishing the losing party.” (Ketchum v. Moses (2001) 24 Cal.4th 1122, 1138-1139.)

Plaintiff has not established a multiplier should be awarded in this standard lemon law case which settled well before trial.

Motion for Costs and Expenses

Plaintiff offered no argument in the memorandum of points and authorities as to the reasonableness, necessity, recoverability and type of costs and expenses requested. The issue can be addressed through the memorandum of costs.