This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:13:28 (UTC).

GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA VS AAA ASSOCIATES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AAA ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4165

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLANUEVA GUILLERMO

Defendants and Respondents

AAA ASSOCIATES LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DANI OLIVA

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON DANIEL J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SECOND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; ORDER

3/24/2017: SECOND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/4/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/19/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/30/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

5/16/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/2/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETR.EMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/25/2017: NOTICE OF SETR.EMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

SUMMONS

12/16/2016: SUMMONS

Unknown

5/19/2017: Unknown

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/27/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRESPASS ;ETC

12/16/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRESPASS ;ETC

STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER

9/29/2017: STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER

CROSS-DEFENDANT GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/3/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT GUILLERMO VILLANUEVA'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/20/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

2/15/2017: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/24/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLALNTIFF GULLERMO VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; ORDER

3/9/2017: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLALNTIFF GULLERMO VILLANUEVA TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; ORDER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Guillermo Villanueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by AAA Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 42; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Stipulation; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • ANSWER OF AAA ASSOCIATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Answer; Filed by AAA Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by AAA Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Guillermo Villanueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Guillermo Villanueva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRESPASS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less