This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 15:40:36 (UTC).

GUADALUPE REJON ET AL VS DAZZLE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 GUADALUPE REJON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DAZZLE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3019

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

REJON GUADALUPE

YUN SOO JUNG

CHUNG SUN

KO KYUNG

SALONGA UNSUN

MORAN MARIBEL

Defendants and Respondents

DAZZLE LLC

FASHION DAZZLE

EB CLOTHING INC.

EB CLOTHING

FASHION DAZZLE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SOLOUKI/SAVOY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FRANK N. LEE

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

DAVID S. LEE

LEE DAVID S.

PETERSEN RICHARD P. LAW OFFICES OF

LEE FRANK N.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/8/2016: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [CAL. LABOR CODE ? 1198 ET SEQ.]; ETC

3/8/2016: CLASS ACTION: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [CAL. LABOR CODE ? 1198 ET SEQ.]; ETC

Minute Order

6/7/2017: Minute Order

Notice

6/19/2017: Notice

Declaration

6/27/2017: Declaration

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 309; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Declaration ORDER AND DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. LAW IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE & DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Order; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff); Maribel Moran (Plaintiff); Kyung Ko (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Notice NOTICE OF COURT'S JUNE 7, 2017 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff); Maribel Moran (Plaintiff); Kyung Ko (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by EB CLOTHING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Dazzle LLC [DISMISSED] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Notice; Filed by EB CLOTHING INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Status Report; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff); Maribel Moran (Plaintiff); Kyung Ko (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff); Maribel Moran (Plaintiff); Kyung Ko (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 310; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CLASS ACTION: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES [CAL. LABOR CODE 1198 ET SEQ.]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Guadalupe Rejon (Plaintiff); Maribel Moran (Plaintiff); Kyung Ko (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dazzle Up, LLC is a litigant