This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 16:06:05 (UTC).

GRUNECKER PATENT-UND RECHTSANWALTE ET AL VS CALEB TECHNOLOGY

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 GRUNECKER PATENT-UND RECHTSANWALTE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CALEB TECHNOLOGY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH R. FEFFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0313

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

GRUNECKER PATENT-UND RECHTSANWALTE PARTG

LAW OFFICES OF GRUNECKER KINKELDEY STO-

PARTG GRUNECKER PATENT-UND RECHTSANWALTE

Defendant and Respondent

CALEB TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YU | MOHANDESI LLP

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

4/23/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF A FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. ?1713]

5/13/2016: COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF A FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. ?1713]

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/19/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/27/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

6/3/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/30/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/22/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/1/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/28/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

JUDGMENT

10/11/2016: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/11/2016: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

10/11/2016: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

10/11/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

10/11/2016: Minute Order

CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/11/2016: CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

10/25/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

Unknown

3/13/2017: Unknown

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Grunecker Patent-Und Rechtsanwalte Partg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF A FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 1713]

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

o % : ) ;fl: fl : }"‘lar:, “%.EL .

YU | MOHANDESI LLP \0 OS

B. Ben Mohandesi (SBN 214921) 213.377.5505 | bmohandesi@yumollp.com A 3 || Pavel Ekmekchyan (SBN 223222)

P—

Sug@i'lar @gw gf Gallfornia ounty of Los Angeles

: 213.985.2007 | pavel@yumollp.com MAY 18 2015 4 || Katharine M. Miner (SBN 288083) 213.985.2004 | kminer@yumollp.com Sherri R. Carter, Exegutive Officer/Clerk 5 || 633 West Fifth Street, Suite 2800 By, _Q&__W_E:JM Deputy ¢ Los Angeles, CA 90071 Cristina Grijai¥2 0 213.377.5501 Facsimile , L o0 Griinecker Patent- und Rechtsanwilte PartG

mbB, a limited liability law partnership, FKA Law Offices of Griinecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair

7 || Attorneys for Plaintiff

9 || & Schwanhidusser GbR, Attorneys-at-Law

) D329 ffluy,@ez%\ ?»c%m/

438 |3 SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA

% £5 14 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT . =t <

25 S2RE~ T |FO

fii T "?I':',5.-!:' = fonsd 5 £ oo 28 2 & *, —1- @ o COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGI\HL,;EDM'ET 3

OO D _—

D0 D0 Do