This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:50:34 (UTC).

GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC., VS HOOMAN NISSANI

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOOMAN NISSANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0892

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GROUNDWORK GROUP INC.

PAYLESS AUTO SALES

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH

Defendants and Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 100

H K AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CALIF. CORP

HC AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CALIF. CORP

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CALIF. CORP.

HOOMAN NISSANI

HOOMAN TOYOTA/NISSAN

PAYLESS CARS. INC. CALIF. CORP

HOOMAN TOYOTA OF LONG BEACH

HOOMAN HYUNDAI OF LOS ANGELES

PAYLESS AUTO SALES

H.S.K. INVESTMENTS LLC

HOOMAN CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM

NISSANI HOOMAN MICHAEL

HOOMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP

HOOMAN NISSAN

H.T.L. AUTOMOTIVE INC. (DOE 1)

HOOMAN OF LAX

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH

HOOMAN TOYOTA NISSAN

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PHILIP LANDSMAN

LANDSMAN PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

MCCREARY DUNCAN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/15/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

10/15/2015: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

3/11/2016: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/18/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/18/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

4/12/2016: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

4/12/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

10/20/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/26/2017: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

6/5/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

4/30/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

2/19/2019: Ex Parte Application

Response

4/12/2019: Response

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Application

5/30/2019: Application

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS? ATTENDANCE OF DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS); Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Advancing and Shortening Time) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Order Advanc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Order Continuing Trial; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing and Shortening Time for Notice on Motion to Compel Deposition; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date Based on Joint Stipulation by Parties; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice of Motion and First Amended Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition by Defendants' Person Most Knowledgeable and Production of Documents; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FRONTLINE FINISH (Legacy Party); GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-03-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by FRONTLINE FINISH (Legacy Party); GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by FRONTLINE FINISH (Legacy Party); GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by GROUNDWORK GROUP, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.