This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 18:49:35 (UTC).

GRIGGS, MARLON BRANDON - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/03/2009 GRIGGS, MARLON BRANDON - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUNA, ANA MARIA, SUZUKI, PAUL T., COWAN, DAVID J., JESSNER, SAMANTHA P., BARRY, WILLIAM, KLEIN, CLIFFORD, PENNY, BRENDA J. and GOETZ, REVA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4689

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUNA, ANA MARIA

SUZUKI, PAUL T.

COWAN, DAVID J.

JESSNER, SAMANTHA P.

BARRY, WILLIAM

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

PENNY, BRENDA J.

GOETZ, REVA

 

Party Details

Appellants and Petitioners

GRANT SHERRY

SEIBERT MICHAEL

LEBOWSKY LAWRENCE M. ESQ

GRANT MISHA

Not Classified By Court

DANIELSON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUPERIOR COURT

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

LEGAL SUPPORT NETWORK

GUTIERREZ RUBEN

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Guardian Ad Litem

SEIBERT MICHAEL J

Appellants and Interested Parties

GRANT MISHA

AREVALO FLERIDA

EAST WEST BANK

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

SOLOMON RICHARD L.

MARVAN JEFFREY ESQ

SCULLY ELIZABETH POTTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

LEBOWSKY LAWRENCE MICHAEL

SCARCELLA CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE

THOMAS NISSAN

BORDEN ALEX ROSS

MARVAN JEFFREY PAUL

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

MARVAN JEFFREY PAUL

SOLOMON RICHARD LAWRENCE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MOORE WILLIAM RICHARD

Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

RIVERA VIVIAN MARIA

BARTON ROBERT CULLEN

Other Attorneys

HINOJOSA LYNARD C. ATTORNEY AT LAW

SHABEL SCOTT LEE ESQ

GOLD RONALD

TAMER STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Amended Proof of Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Service - Amended Proof of Service

Notice - Notice of entry of Order

10/3/2022: Notice - Notice of entry of Order

Order - Final Distribution - Fifth And Final Account And Report

9/7/2022: Order - Final Distribution - Fifth And Final Account And Report

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

9/4/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Minute Order

8/31/2022: Minute Order

Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

8/18/2022: Nunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

Minute Order

8/17/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

8/17/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

8/17/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Second Supplement to Fifth and Final Account and Report of Guardian of the Estate and Petition for Order Settling and Approving thereof; etc.

8/10/2022: Supplement - Second Supplement to Fifth and Final Account and Report of Guardian of the Estate and Petition for Order Settling and Approving thereof; etc.

Minute Order

6/16/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/16/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - First Supplement to Fifth and Final Account and Report of Guardian of the Estate and Petition for Order Settling and Approving thereof; Allowing Guardian's Fees and Costs advanced; Allowi

6/9/2022: Supplement - First Supplement to Fifth and Final Account and Report of Guardian of the Estate and Petition for Order Settling and Approving thereof; Allowing Guardian's Fees and Costs advanced; Allowi

Miscellaneous Document - Confidential Financial Documents returned to attorney (191 pages)

5/19/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Confidential Financial Documents returned to attorney (191 pages)

Notice - Hearing

5/16/2022: Notice - Hearing

Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship - FIFTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE AND PETITION FOR ORDER

5/16/2022: Accounting - Conservatorship/Guardianship - FIFTH AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE AND PETITION FOR ORDER

Withdrawal - Special Notice

4/4/2022: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/30/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

824 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Amended Proof of Service ); Filed by Guardian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of entry of Order ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution (Fifth And Final Account And Report )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 3, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 3, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 3, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 3, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,069 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2010
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved as Counsel (1st Hearing Date: 10/13/2010 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Shabel, Scott Lee, ESQ., Former Attorney for Petitioner Motion Num: 1 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketReceipt (CAROLYN NIX Filed By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Shabel, Scott Lee, ESQ., Former Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Filed By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Hinojosa, Lynard C., Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Filed by: Attorney for Guardian )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketDuties of Guardian (Filed by: Attorney for Guardian Guardian: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Hinojosa, Lynard C., Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Depew, Brenda, Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketBond ($6,000.00 - QUALIFYING BOND Filed by: Attorney for Guardian Posted By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketLetters (BOND IS FIXED AT $6,000.00 Filed by: Attorney for Guardian Issued To:: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Hinojosa, Lynard C., Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Depew, Brenda, Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (PROBATE COVER SHEERT Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Hinojosa, Lynard C., Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketOrder (APPT GUARDIAN OF MINOR ESTATE OF MARLON GRIGGS Filed By: Grant, Sherry, Petitioner Repres By: Hinojosa, Lynard C., Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANIELSON NATIONALINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LEGAL SUPPORT NETWORK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EAST WEST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant