This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2020 at 22:44:44 (UTC).

GRETCHEN CALHOUN VS RON D GALLEMORE

Case Summary

On 02/09/2015 GRETCHEN CALHOUN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RON D GALLEMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1938

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CALHOUN GRETCHEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

GALLEMORE RON D.

RETINA MACULAR INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE GIRARDI FIRM LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SLAVIN HOWARD A. ESQ.

WERRE GREGORY DALE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00

9/26/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00

Legacy Document -

9/26/2018: Legacy Document -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application To C...)

1/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application To C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND EXTENDING 5 YEAR RULE SIGNED

9/18/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND EXTENDING 5 YEAR RULE SIGNED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE CURRENT TRIAL...)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE CURRENT TRIAL...)

Substitution of Attorney

1/22/2020: Substitution of Attorney

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

2/9/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

DEFENDANTS RON D. GALLEMORE, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND (3) LACK OF INFORMED CONSENT; DE

6/30/2015: DEFENDANTS RON D. GALLEMORE, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND (3) LACK OF INFORMED CONSENT; DE

ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TR1AL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/7/2016: ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TR1AL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order -

2/22/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/8/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/7/2017: Minute Order -

DECLARATION -

6/7/2017: DECLARATION -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

10/11/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

10/11/2017: Minute Order -

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • Hearing05/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Hearing05/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ron D. Gallemore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Current Trial Date and All Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue the Current Trial Date and All Related Dates); Filed by Gretchen Calhoun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Current Trial...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial (/ Final Status Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Gretchen Calhoun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPAMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ron D. Gallemore (Defendant); Retina Macular Institute (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Ron D. Gallemore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RON D. GALLEMORE, AN INDIVIDUAL; AND RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; (2) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; AND (3) LACK OF INFORMED CONSENT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gretchen Calhoun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Retina Macula Institute is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLAVIN HOWARD A. ESQ.