This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 22:37:31 (UTC).

GRACIE REED VS SANDSTONE PROPERTIES , L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2012 GRACIE REED filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SANDSTONE PROPERTIES , L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINTO, R. BRUCE, DUKES, ROBERT A. and SIRNA, SALVATORE T.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3642

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINTO, R. BRUCE

DUKES, ROBERT A.

SIRNA, SALVATORE T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED GRACIE

Defendants

RELIABLE GENERAL PARTNER

SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALLISTER RAYMOND G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department G; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Transfer to Municipal Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department G, Sirna, Salvatore T., Presiding; Conference-Case Management (/ TRIAL SETTING/ WALKER HEARING) - Transfer to Municipal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department G; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department H; (Status Hearing; Transferred to Other Department) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department G, Sirna, Salvatore T., Presiding; Status Hearing (Remanded April 2, 2013) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department H; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (RELIABLE GENERAL PARTNER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SANSTONE PROPERTIES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GRACIE REED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RP PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CENTER FOR DISABILITY ACCESS - RAYMOND G BALLISTER JR