This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:40:35 (UTC).

GRACE MUNOZ ET AL VS EFRAIN MUNOZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2016 GRACE MUNOZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EFRAIN MUNOZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5473

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MUNOZ GRACE

Defendants and Respondents

MUNOZ EFRAIN

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

LEE LECONG

YANG TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

INJURY SPECIALTY LAWYERS APC

WILLFORD THOMAS MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DOYLE MEREDITH CHASE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE. WRONGFUL DEATH

3/8/2018: ANSWER?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE. WRONGFUL DEATH

Answer

3/22/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/22/2018: Cross-Complaint

REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

3/26/2018: REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

3/8/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

3/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

SUMMONS

7/1/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND HIRING; ETC

7/1/2016: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND HIRING; ETC

Minute Order

12/15/2017: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Lecong Lee (Defendant); Tina Yang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For continuance of FSC, Trial Date, and all Related Cut-Off Dates Pursuant to Stipulation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (For continuance of FSC, Trial Date, and all Related Cut-Off Dates Pursuant to Stipulation); Filed by Lecong Lee (Defendant); Tina Yang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Ex-Parte Application For continuance o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Efrain Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; (OSC RE Dismissal; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Grace Munoz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND HIRING; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC625473    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 2

Munoz, et al. v. Munoz, et al.

Motion by Defendants Leocong Lee and Tina Yang for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is taken off calendar because of the following defects:

1. The proof of service does not include a service list of individuals identifying who was served with the motion.

2. The motion purports to have settled the action on behalf of a minor, Adan Munoz, Jr., who is not a party to the action, nor is there an order appointing a Guardian ad Litem on his behalf.

3. The Court cannot approve the settlement allocation of the minor’s claim until a Petition for Approval of Compromise of a Minor’s Claim is filed and approved.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.