Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 15:33:32 (UTC).

GRACE MAPP VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 GRACE MAPP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6958

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Petitioners

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

MAPP GRACE

DOES 1 TO 100

Defendant and Respondent

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHALHOUB GEORGE J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BACIO GARY A. ESQ.

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

1/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

3/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/28/2016: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/4/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/4/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/4/2017: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/15/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/21/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, County of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Grace Mapp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less