Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 13:20:35 (UTC).

GLORIA HUBBARD VS KINDRED HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 06/24/2008 GLORIA HUBBARD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KINDRED HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE A. CONNOR, LEE SMALLEY EDMON and RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7598

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JACQUELINE A. CONNOR

LEE SMALLEY EDMON

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUBBARD LINDA

HUBBARD PHILLIP

HUBBARD III JAMES

HUBBARD JAMES. III

HUBBARD GLORIA

Defendants

KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC

ENGALNOFF GILAT M.D.

THC ORANGE COUNTY INC.

MUN M.D. DONG W.

HOURANI D.O. JAMEEL

MIN DONG W. M.D.

KINDERCARE HEALTHCARE INC.

WILLIAMS. TRUDE

KINDER HEALTHCARE OF LOS ANGELES

KINDER HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

KINDRED HOSPITAL-LOS ANGELES

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

ENGLANOFF M.D. GILAT

HOURANI JAMEEL D.O.

J.M. HOURANI INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISS JERRIE S

BERGLUND & JOHNSON

BERGLUND JOHNSON&SOMMER

Defendant Attorneys

PATTERSON LOCKWOOD HARRIS & JURICE

PATTERSON RITNER LOCKWOOD & JURICH

GIOVANNIELLO & MICHELS

HILLYER KEVIN P.

GIOVANNIELLO ALEXANDER F.

CREASON & AARVIG

GIOVANNEILLO & MICHELS LLP

SCHMID & VOILES

Other Attorneys

GARCIA LAW FIRM. THE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2009
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Request for Dismissal (AS TO ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Notice (RE OSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (ENTIRE COMPLAINT AS TO DONG MUN, M.D. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • Notice of Lien Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (DEFENDANTS KINDRED HEALTHCARE, INC KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC; THC ORANGE COUNTY, INC DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES; TRUDE WILLIAMS; JAMEEL HOURANI, D.O.; J.M. HOURANI, INC) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • Motion for Summary Judgment (POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED ORDER; ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; PROPOSED ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO DEFENDANT-5 TRUDE WILLIAMS, BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 08-04-08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO DEFENDANT-1 KINDRED HEALTHCARE, INC. BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 08-04-08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO DEFENDANT-3: KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC. BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07-30-08 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REJECTION OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: NOTICE MUST INCLUDE: LIST OF ALL CASES THAT MAY BE CONSIDERED AS BEING RELATED....... .................................) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Declaration (RE: SUCCESSORS OF INTEREST; COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • Opposition (TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • Response (TO OPP TO MTN TO QUASH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LOS ANGELES is a litigant