This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:29:31 (UTC).

GLORIA COX VS SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/15/2015 GLORIA COX filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4258

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COX GLORIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 200

THOCHIM MARSHA A. NP

LUU DARRIN D. M.D.

SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP

DOES 101 THROUGH 110 NOMINAL DEFENDANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

O'NEIL THOMAS M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL DEATH/PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

12/15/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL DEATH/PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR OF INTEREST WITH COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

12/15/2015: DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR OF INTEREST WITH COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/28/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF DANIELLE HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

2/19/2016: DECLARATION OF DANIELLE HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS, ETC.

2/19/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS, ETC.

DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/19/2016: DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/19/2016: DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN U. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P.

2/19/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN U. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P.

DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/19/2016: DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. THOCHIM, N.P.

3/17/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN D. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. THOCHIM, N.P.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET CASE FOR TRIAL WITHIN. 120 DAYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF ANGEL MARTI, III

4/12/2016: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET CASE FOR TRIAL WITHIN. 120 DAYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF ANGEL MARTI, III

REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET CASE FOR TRIAL WITHIN 120 DAYS

4/18/2016: REPLY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET CASE FOR TRIAL WITHIN 120 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/16/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/14/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/9/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Gloria Cox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Gloria Cox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 93; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by Sierra Medical Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANTS, SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, DARRIN U. LUU, M.D., AND MARSHA A. TROCHIM, N.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DANIELLE HALL IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gloria Cox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Gloria Cox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR OF INTEREST WITH COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Gloria Cox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WRONGFUL DEATH/PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.