This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:04:53 (UTC).

GLENN GAZA ET AL VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATI

Case Summary

On 12/24/2015 GLENN GAZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT, RAMONA G. SEE, STUART M. RICE, WILLIAM G. WILLETT, JOEL L. LOFTON and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5459

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

WILLIAM G. WILLETT

JOEL L. LOFTON

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

GAZA GLENN

MATSUMURA-LEM KAREN

WILSON SR. JOHN

QUAST DIANE

TAKAKI FRANK

QUAST STEVE

KUNIHIRO DOROTHY

WILSON JR. JOHN

TAKAKI MICHAEL

MATSUMRA LEM KAREN

Defendants and Respondents

STATE OF CALIFORNIA-CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

BROSTEIN MARGO

DOES 1 THROUGH 125

REDONDO BEACH CITY OF

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH

Minors and Not Classified By Court

GAZA ANGELA

GAZA MAGDALENA

LEM JASPER

QUAST JULIA

MATSUMRA LEM KAREN

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

COLLINSON LISA D. ESQ.

PANISH BRIAN J. ESQ.

BRIAN J. PANISH ESQ.

LISA D. COLLINSON ESQ

PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH ESQ.

COLLINSON LISA DAWN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MCCUNE & HARBER

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

DAVID LEE

ROBET A. BRAGGS

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN & DEAN

CHRISTINE A. SAHAKIAN

BRAGGS ROBET A.

SAHAKIAN CHRISTINE A.

LEE DAVID

MORRIS JEFFREY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADAM SHEA IN SUPPORT OF MINORS' COMPROMISE PETITIONS

3/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADAM SHEA IN SUPPORT OF MINORS' COMPROMISE PETITIONS

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint

9/11/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint

Summons

9/15/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint

9/15/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-10-25 00:00:00

10/25/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-10-25 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

11/14/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/18/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/19/2018: Case Management Statement

Declaration -

9/6/2018: Declaration -

Notice of Motion -

9/6/2018: Notice of Motion -

Declaration -

9/6/2018: Declaration -

Request for Dismissal -

8/23/2018: Request for Dismissal -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/13/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/13/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ADAM K. SHEA

5/12/2017: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ADAM K. SHEA

Minute Order -

5/15/2017: Minute Order -

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:51 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Adam Shea in Support of Minors' Compromise Petitions); Filed by MAGDALENA GAZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by MAGDALENA GAZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Adam Shea in Support of Minors' Compromise Petitions); Filed by GLENN GAZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY - PERSONAL INJURY 2. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY - WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND PERSONAL INJURY DAMAGES 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY - PERSONAL INJURY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GLENN GAZA (Plaintiff); DOROTHY KUNIHIRO (Plaintiff); KAREN MATSUMURA-LEM (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.