This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:07:52 (UTC).

GLENDALE COMMUNITY CHURCH VS. NICHOLAS C. KERN

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 GLENDALE COMMUNITY CHURCH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NICHOLAS C KERN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4022

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASCO DENIS

CASCO MARIA

GLENDALE COMMUNITY CHURCH

CRISTO CREYENTES UNIDOS EN

BENITEZ LUIS

Defendants

KERN NICHOLAS C.

QUINN SAMUEL E.

SCOTT JOHN E.

FELLOWSHIP FAITH CHRISTIAN

CLAYTON DR. JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REHWALD RAMESON LEWIS & GLASNER

CHALEFF REHWALD A PROF. CORP.

Defendant Attorneys

GARY TILL & BURLINGHAM

ROWE MULLER LLP

 

Court Documents

Status Conference Report

9/10/2018: Status Conference Report

Request for Dismissal

11/7/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice

11/9/2018: Notice

Request For Copies

11/9/2018: Request For Copies

Notice

11/9/2018: Notice

Notice of Status Conference and Order

9/18/2018: Notice of Status Conference and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Notice (of release of pendency of action); Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Request For Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Notice (of release of pendency of action); Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Status Conference (Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Status Conference Report AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-11-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Request for Continuance; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Glendale Community Church (Plaintiff); Denis Casco (Plaintiff); Maria Casco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Declaration; Filed by Creyentes Unidos En Cristo (Plaintiff); Luis Benitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less