This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2016 at 17:36:53 (UTC).

GIUSEPPINA MORREALE VS ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2010 GIUSEPPINA MORREALE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAUL A. SAHAGUN and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7787

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORREALE GIUSEPPINA

MORREALE ANTONIO AN INDIV.

Defendants

THC-PRANGE COUNTY INC.

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC.

KINDRED HOSPITAL-LA MIRADA

ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC.

WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER

Other

FILE COPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GIOVANNIELLO & MICHELS LLP.

LEWIS BRISBOIS & BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2011
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • Partial Dismissal With Prejudice (AS TO THE ELDER ABUSE AND PATIENT'S BILL OF RIGHTS CLAIMS ONLY; AND ONLY AS TO DEFENDANTS ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC dba WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER; ENSIGN FACILITY SERVICES, INC.) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Reply To Motion (TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCS. IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS. SET ONE, FROM DEFENDANT ENSIGN WHITTIER EAS) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • Opposition (TO PLAIN. MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUC- TION OF DOCS., SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS BY DEFEND. ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST, LLC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • Motion to Compel Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • Notice of Motion Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER HILLS HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL - LA MIRADA is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant