Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:46:56 (UTC).

GIOVANNI NOLL ET AL VS JAMES ROBERT MARCUS

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 GIOVANNI NOLL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES ROBERT MARCUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5127

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

NOLLI GIOVANNI

KINSEY JAN

Defendants and Respondents

MARCUS JAMEES ROBERT

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WALCH ROBERT S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PHAN TIONI A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CoverSheet

10/12/2016: CoverSheet

Summons

10/12/2016: Summons

Complaint

10/12/2016: Complaint

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/4/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/4/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/4/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/19/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/28/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Giovanni Nolli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Jamees Robert Marcus (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Jamees Robert Marcus (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Giovanni Nolli (Plaintiff); Jan Kinsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Giovanni Nolli (Plaintiff); Jan Kinsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Giovanni Nolli (Plaintiff); Jan Kinsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jamees Robert Marcus (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHAN TIONI A.