This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 14:09:36 (UTC).

GINA LYNN WOOD ET AL VS SATNAM SINGH ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/22/2014 GINA LYNN WOOD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SATNAM SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3439

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TOP GUN LTD.

WOOD GINA LYNN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SINGH SATNAM

UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS INCOR-

UNITED TAXI OF THE SOUTH-WEST

TESHOME TEKLETSION (DOE 1)

TESHOME TEKLETSION DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRANCESCHI ERNEST J. JR. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DOHERTY JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

4/22/2014: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

SUMMONS -

4/22/2014: SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMLAINT;

5/28/2014: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMLAINT;

DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

5/28/2014: DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

6/9/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/2/2014: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS SATNAM SINGH, UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS, INCORPORATED AND UNITED TAXI OF THE SOUTH-WEST?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISD

9/23/2014: DEFENDANTS SATNAM SINGH, UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS, INCORPORATED AND UNITED TAXI OF THE SOUTH-WEST?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISD

DECLARATION OF ERNEST J. FRANCESCHI, JR. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION; EXHIBIT

10/20/2014: DECLARATION OF ERNEST J. FRANCESCHI, JR. IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION; EXHIBIT

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION

10/23/2014: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER RECLASSIFYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECLASSIFY AND TRANSFER ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION

10/31/2014: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECLASSIFY AND TRANSFER ACTION TO LIMITED JURISDICTION

Minute Order -

10/31/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ERNEST J. FRANCESCHI, JR; AND EXHIBITS

3/27/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF ERNEST J. FRANCESCHI, JR; AND EXHIBITS

DECLARATION OF PAUL F. SULLIVAN IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

5/27/2015: DECLARATION OF PAUL F. SULLIVAN IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order -

6/8/2015: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

7/23/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/23/2015: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/24/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gina Lynn Wood (Plaintiff); Top Gun, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by United Independent Taxi Drivers, Incor- (Defendant); United Taxi of the South-West (Defendant); Teshome, Tekletsion (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gina Lynn Wood (Plaintiff); Top Gun, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Gina Lynn Wood (Plaintiff); Top Gun, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Satnam Singh (Defendant); United Independent Taxi Drivers, Incor- (Defendant); United Taxi of the South-West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketDEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Satnam Singh (Defendant); United Independent Taxi Drivers, Incor- (Defendant); United Taxi of the South-West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gina Lynn Wood (Plaintiff); Top Gun, Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED TAXI OF THE SOUTHWEST is a litigant

Latest cases where TOP GUN LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED INDEPENDENT TAXI DRIVERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOHERTY JOHN ESQ.