Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2016 at 10:33:48 (UTC).

GIANGREGORIO, MARIA VS. GORDO, EDUARDO A.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 GIANGREGORIO, MARIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GORDO, EDUARDO A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1104

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GIANGREGORIO MARIA

Respondent

GORDO EDUARDO A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2012
  • Declaration-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Notice-Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336 Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336 Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Summons-Amended Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Statement-Financial Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Petition-Amended (1st) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Request- Waive Court Fees Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Statement-Financial Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition-Dissolution Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less