Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 03:49:31 (UTC).

GERARDO IBARRA VS. KAREN SUE SIKORA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 GERARDO IBARRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KAREN SUE SIKORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1825

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBARRA GERARDO

Defendants

SIKORA KAREN SUE

SIKORA ROGER

Not Classified By Court

MEADVILLE STEVE A. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOUTHWEST LEGAL GROUP

Defendant Attorney

EARLY MASLACH & O'SHEA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/24/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

5/31/2013: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; Case Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (w/o prej entire action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Cause off calendar - settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by GERARDO IBARRA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERARDO IBARRA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration (RE: MAILING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration (RE: DUE DILIGENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by GERARDO IBARRA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PERSONALLY SERVED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less