This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 08:05:01 (UTC).

NOEL M FRASER ET AL VS BOETHING TREELAND NURSERY CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2012 NOEL M FRASER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BOETHING TREELAND NURSERY CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NO ASSIGNED. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7405

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NO ASSIGNED

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FRASER GERALDINE

FRASER NOEL M.

HARLAN WENDY L.

FRASER ANDREW M.

BOETHING TREELAND NURSUERY CO.

Defendants and Respondents

BOETHING TREELAND NURSERY CO.

DOES 1-350

GREEN THUMB NURSERY

SCOTTS COMPANY LLC THE

SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO COMPANY THE

SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC.

TREELAND CONEJO

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

THE SCOTTS COMPANY LLC

CONEJO TREELAND

NURSERY GREEN THUMB

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WATERS KRAUS & PAUL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG LLP

KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

WFBM LLP ORANGE

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RULINGS

11/6/2015: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RULINGS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/10/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

11/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

11/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

11/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Objection - THE SCOTTTS COMPANY LLC'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' PAGE/LINE DESIGNATIONS OF TRIAL TESTIMONY FROM RICHARD MARTINEZ TAKEN ON MARCH 6, 2013

11/12/2015: Objection - THE SCOTTTS COMPANY LLC'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' PAGE/LINE DESIGNATIONS OF TRIAL TESTIMONY FROM RICHARD MARTINEZ TAKEN ON MARCH 6, 2013

Trial Brief

11/12/2015: Trial Brief

Objection - THE SCOTTS COMPANY LLC'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PAGE/LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JOHN KENNEDY TAKEN ON APRIL 4,2013

11/12/2015: Objection - THE SCOTTS COMPANY LLC'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PAGE/LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JOHN KENNEDY TAKEN ON APRIL 4,2013

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/13/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Trial Brief

11/13/2015: Trial Brief

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

11/16/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

Brief

11/16/2015: Brief

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

11/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

11/19/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (Appeal filed for 4/21/16 and 9/12/16. B271747); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (re: Plaintiffs' motion to tax costs as to Defendant The Scotts Company LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees (complex fee due Super Garden Centers ); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE; STRICT LIABILITY; FALSE REPRESENTATION; INTENTIONAL TORT/INTENTIONAL FAILURE TO WARN; AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GERALDINE FRASER (Plaintiff); ANDREW M. FRASER (Plaintiff); WENDY L. HARLAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER GARDEN CENTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Scott is a litigant

Latest cases where UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, a subsidiary of The Dow Chemical Company is a litigant