This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 08:55:52 (UTC).

GEOVANNY MARTINEZ ET AL VS RAMIN JAVAHERY MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2008 GEOVANNY MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RAMIN JAVAHERY MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSS KLEIN, TRACY GRANT, MORRIS B. JONES, PHRASEL L. SHELTON and REFERENCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0917

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSS KLEIN

TRACY GRANT

MORRIS B. JONES

PHRASEL L. SHELTON

REFERENCE

 

Party Details

Defendants

COAST NEUROSURGICAL ASSOCIATES

RAYHAUN ABRAHAM M.D. ( DOE 1 )

JAVAHERY RAMIN M.D.

PAK HOOSHANG M.D. ( DOE 2 )

DOES 1 - 30 INC.

MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL

LAFOLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

RAYHAUN ABRAHAM M.D. DOE 1

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAFF DUMMIT

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

PAK HOOSHANG M.D. DOE 2

Minor

MARTINEZ GEOVANNY

Guardian Ad Litem

ALVARADO ASTRID

Not Classified By Court

LALLANDE M. LAWRENCE SR. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAFF ( DUMMIT )

LAFOLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

Minor Attorney

MICHELS & WATKINS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SP86, Ross Klein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST2) OSC RE FAILURE TO FILEDISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT;CF 11/12OFF CAL CASE DISM'D) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketReceipt-Deposit Funds-Blocked Acct (plntf - martinez receipt and acknowledgment of ord. deposit of special need trust WESSTAMERICA BANK TRUSTE OF GEOVAN NY MARTINEZ SPECIAL NEED TRUST WAB00146000); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (PLNTF- MARTINEZ WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTIN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department Legacy; (PETITION-MISC; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • Docketat 08:35 am in Department SP86, Ross Klein, Presiding; PETITION-MISC (1- PETN FOR MINOR'S COMP( M/P P MARTINEZ )2 - OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILEDISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT) - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • DocketOrder; Filed by ASTRID ALVARADO (Legacy Party); GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
357 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ASTRID ALVARADO (Legacy Party); GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P.S SUMMONS, COMP, SOD, ETC. P.S COAST NEUROSURGICAL ASSOCAITES TO SRV-RAMIN JAVAHERY-AUTH TO ACPT SUB SERVED JANE DOE, NAME REFUSED (F B 20'S 5'3" 100 # BRN/BRN ) IN CHARGE 4-10-8 + DECL MAIL); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed (PLNTF - MARTINEZ ORIGINAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED THIS DATE. ( AFTER GAL ISSUED AND SIGNED BY JUDGE ) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (PLNTF - MARTINEZ APPL AND ORDER FOR APPT OF GAL APPLICANT ASTRID ALVARADO, IS APPT'D AG GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GIOVANNY MARTINEZ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by ASTRID ALVARADO (Legacy Party); GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketSummons; Filed by GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • DocketComplaint Filed ( NO SUMMONS ISSU'D )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2005
  • DocketNotice (PLNTF - MARTINEZ PLNTF'S NOTICE THAT MOS TO COMPEL DEFT MILLER CHILDREN'S HOSP. TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPS TO PLNTF'S 8TH SET OF INSPECTION CAT 2 & FURTHER RESPS,, O.C. 8-13-9); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2005
  • DocketNotice; Filed by GEOVANNY MARTINEZ (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES is a litigant

Latest cases where COAST NEUROSURGICAL ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLER CHILREN'S HOSPITAL is a litigant